Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Kipke, Kramer, Morhaim, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from refusing to insure, refusing to continue to insure, limiting the amount or extent or kind of coverage available to an individual, or charge an individual a different rate for the same coverage solely for reasons associated with an applicant's or insured's future lawful travel plans unless specified conditions are met; and deeming an insurer to meet the conditions for the otherwise prohibited actions under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM