Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Schuh, Aumann, Braveboy, Eckardt, Frush, Gaines, Griffith, Haddaway-Riccio, Ivey, James, Jameson, Jones, Pena-Melnyk, Schulz, Stifler, Valderrama, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to develop a training program for law enforcement agencies, prosecutors, public defenders, juvenile detention center staff, and others involved in the criminal justice system and juvenile justice system in addressing human trafficking; requiring the training program to focus on specified issues; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to seek the input and participation of specified organizations in the development of the training program.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM