Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/9/2020 2:28:33 AM
Thursday, April 9, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 4/7/2020 4:09 PM
Appropriations Committee
2:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Zoom Meeting - Overview Document

Other
School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 3/9/2020 9:26 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 7th Floor Board Room, Nancy S. Grasmick Education Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
10:30 AM to 12:00 PM - 7th Floor Board Room, Nancy S. Grasmick Education Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Town Hall Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional information will be available at iac.maryland.gov.
Discussion of IAC agenda business.
(Added - 4/3/2020 12:40 PM)
Public meeting to discuss normal IAC agenda business.
(Removed - 4/3/2020 12:40 PM)

Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 10/23/2019 10:49 AM
9:00 AM - Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Conference Call
Monthly Meeting
To join by phone:
(Added - 4/3/2020 1:43 PM)
1-855-797-9480 (US toll free)
(Added - 4/3/2020 1:43 PM)
+1-415-655-0045 (US toll)
(Added - 4/3/2020 1:43 PM)
Access Code: 614-705-963
(Added - 4/3/2020 1:43 PM)