Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Insurance Administration, Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing fees for an initial SHOP Exchange navigator license, a renewal, and a reinstatement; providing that the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act relating to annual limitations on cost sharing and deductibles, child-only plan offerings, minimum benefit requirements for catastrophic plans, health insurance premium rates, coverage for individuals participating in approved clinical trials, and contract requirements for specified dental plans apply to specified coverage in specified insurance markets; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, January 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396585/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467578/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-37)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {396585/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Finance 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {467578/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10) 60
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (86-37) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1005, 15-1105, 15-1201, 15-1203, 15-1205, 15-1206, 15-1207, 15-1208.1, 15-1208.2, 15-1209, 15-1213, 15-1301, 15-1302, 15-1309, 15-1315, 15-1316, 15-1317, 15-137.1, 15-1410, 15-418, 15-508, 15-508.1, 15-509, 15-605, 2-112, 31-101, 31-112 )
(   2005, 2007, 2008, 2011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM