Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Adams, Anderson, Campos, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, S. Howard, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Lam, McComas, McConkey, McMillan, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a specified charge of animal cruelty, as a condition of sentencing, to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs, not exceeding a specified amount, incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0393
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {712812/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948173/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Delegates Vallario, Rosenberg, and Anderson
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {712812/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {948173/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Delegates Vallario, Rosenberg, and Anderson 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-606, 10-607, 10-608, 10-615 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM