Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Law Enforcement Officer - Misconduct In Office
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Glenn, McIntosh, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer, while acting in the course of the officer's official duties, from committing a misdemeanor or felony that carries a maximum penalty of imprisonment of more than 1 year; providing a penalty for a violation of the Act; providing that a sentence imposed under the Act shall be consecutive to and not concurrent with any other sentence imposed for any crime based on the act establishing the violation; and defining a term.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM