Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Anderson, Arora, Barve, Bates, Boteler, Branch, Cane, Cardin, Carter, Cullison, Dumais, Dwyer, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Holmes, Hough, Hucker, Ivey, James, Kramer, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McHale, Mizeur, Norman, Oaks, Otto, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stukes, Tarrant, V. Turner, Vallario, Vaughn, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who adopts a cat or dog from an animal shelter or a rescue facility a maximum credit of $100 against the State income tax; providing that an individual may not claim the credit for more than 1 taxable year with respect to the same cat or dog; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0882 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM