Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, B. Barnes, Cluster, Hornberger, Impallaria, Kipke, Long, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Reznik, Szeliga, Valderrama, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from six to seven the number of video lottery operation licenses and from 16,000 to 19,000 the number of video lottery terminals that may be awarded by the Video Lottery Facility Location Commission to provide for the award of a license at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport under specified circumstances; authorizing up to 2,500 video lottery terminals at the airport; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0817 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-05, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM