Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hammen, Harper, Mitchell, Oaks, Rosenberg, Stukes, Tarrant, and M. Washington
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of a specified violation of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court and the Administrative Office of the Courts, in conjunction with the Administration, to establish specified procedures; requiring that a specified number of driver's license points be assessed for violations of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0197 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952614/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-8)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948674/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Carter, Clippinger, and McComas
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators Gladden, Muse, and Shank
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-25)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {952614/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-8) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {948674/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Carter, Clippinger, and McComas 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators Gladden, Muse, and Shank 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (111-25) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
(   16-402, 26-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM