Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Rudolph, James, Norman, McComas, and Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to study and report on the status of its initiative to implement all-electronic tolling; requiring the study to address specified matters, including an analysis of all-electronic tolling in other states and a description of various all-electronic tolling programs; requiring the Authority to submit the report on or before January 1, 2016; and prohibiting the Authority from implementing all-electronic tolling at the Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge before January 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305566/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {305566/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM