Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protective Order and Peace Order Petitions - Maryland Residents
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Angel, Barkley, Carter, Chang, Dumais, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hill, Jalisi, Kittleman, Lam, Lierman, McCray, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, B. Robinson, Smith, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the filing of a protective order petition if the abuse is alleged to have occurred in the State or if the person eligible for relief is a resident of the State; and authorizing the filing of a peace order petition if a specified act is alleged to have occurred in the State or if the petitioner is a resident of the State; declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly that an order for protection issued by a court of this State shall be accorded full faith and credit by a court of another state; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538275/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {538275/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-504, 4-508.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM