Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Bartlett, Carey, Charles, Chisholm, Clark, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Howard, Ivey, Kelly, Kipke, Morgan, Reznik, Szeliga, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Restricting to Monday through Friday between 6 a.m. and 9 a.m. and between 4 p.m. and 7 p.m. the days and hours during which the passenger requirement applies on the portion of U.S. Route 50 designated as a high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane, between Interstate 95/Interstate 495 and U.S. Route 301; and authorizing the State Highway Administration to suspend the day and time restrictions if it determines that the restrictions do not comply with federal law.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1412 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM