Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Walker, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Frick, Hornberger, C. Howard, Luedtke, Mosby, and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for certain calendar years the authorization to use certain Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery proceeds for operating loss assistance by the Ocean Downs Race Course and Rosecroft Raceway to support a minimum of 40 annual live racing days at each race course.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 33
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-28 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM