Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates F. Turner, Afzali, Anderson, Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bohanan, Boteler, Braveboy, Bromwell, Cane, Cardin, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guzzone, Harper, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Hogan, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, James, Jones, Kaiser, K. Kelly, Krebs, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McDermott, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mizeur, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, O'Donnell, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Stukes, Summers, Swain, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, Weir, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Disabilities, in cooperation with the National Federation of the Blind, to study and make recommendations regarding accessibility concepts in computer science, information systems, and information technology programs in higher education; requiring the Department to submit a preliminary report on or before December 15, 2015, and a final report on or before June 30, 2017, of findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0446
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794566/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-3)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254337/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {794566/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-3) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 26
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {254337/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM