Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Fennell, Barron, Barve, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hixson, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers that employ 15 or more employees from seeking salary history information for an employee by specified methods and screening an applicant for employment based on the applicant's salary history by taking specified actions; specifying that an applicant for employment or an employee is not prohibited from voluntarily sharing salary history information with an employer; specifying that an employer is not subject to a specified criminal penalty for a violation of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463698/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {593229/1 (Delegate C. Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-47)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Equal Pay - Job Announcement and Salary History Information Disclosures
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {463698/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Floor Amendment {593229/1 (Delegate C. Wilson) Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 43
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-47) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-304.1, 3-304.2, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM