Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State House Trust to ensure that the Thurgood Marshall Memorial statues on Lawyer's Mall are maintained in the same material condition in which they were on July 1, 2018; providing that the Thurgood Marshall Memorial statues on Lawyer's Mall may be removed as necessary only under certain conditions; making the Act contingent on the completion of construction on Lawyer's Mall begun in August 2018 by the Department of General Services; and prohibiting the removal of the statutes except under certain conditions; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0999 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166787/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {166787/1 Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 7:10 PM