Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - Improvements to Commercial Real Property
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of St. Mary's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on commercial real property that is located in an eligible area of the county and that has been improved on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting the tax credit from exceeding 25% of the county property tax; requiring the governing body of St. Mary's County to define, by law, certain eligibility criteria; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - Improvements to Commercial Real Property
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 8:50 AM