Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barve, Cardin, Frush, Kach, Kramer, McMillan, Stukes, F. Turner, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a dog from being determined to be potentially dangerous based solely on the breed, type, or heritage of the dog; prohibiting a county from enacting a local law and a municipality from adopting an ordinance prohibiting a person from owning, keeping, or harboring a dog of a specified breed, type, or heritage or take specified other actions based on the breed, type, or heritage of the dog; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0991
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172419/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {758175/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {758175/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {172419/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {758175/1 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {758175/1 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-619 )
(   13-102.1, 5-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM