Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Gilchrist, Afzali, Barkley, Barve, Hixson, A. Miller, Schuh, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans within a specified subtraction modification for retirement income if the income is from the tax-free rollover of the distribution from an employee retirement system.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM