Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barve, Cullison, Gilchrist, Hucker, Kaiser, Lee, Luedtke, F. Turner, Cardin, Howard, McDonough, Nathan-Pulliam, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with specified entities, to develop policies and to implement a program to provide awareness to coaches, school personnel, students, and parents or guardians of students on the risk of sudden cardiac arrest; requiring a county board of education to provide information and a notice to specified students and parents or guardians; requiring a student and parent or guardian to sign a specified statement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565169/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {565169/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-436 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM