Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barve, Cain, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Kaiser, Kelly, Lierman, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pendergrass, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Valderrama, and C. Watson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's transit bus fleet that are not electric buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; requiring the report to include a plan for transitioning any adversely affected State employees to other employment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 10:30 AM