Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Barve, and A. Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to allow persons required to file a personal property tax report to file the report and pay the filing fee electronically; providing that a fee may be charged for each electronic filing; and providing the Act shall be applied to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565664/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-76)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {973229/1 Rejected (44-90)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-26)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {565664/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-76) 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {973229/1 Rejected (44-90) 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (110-26) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101 through 11-103, 11-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM