Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the City of Annapolis to the list of subdivisions in which a holder of an alcoholic beverages license may exercise all of the privileges conferred by that license on the day of any election in that subdivision.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0089
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983096/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {983096/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM