Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law governing the Elderly Rental Housing Program, the Nonprofit Rehabilitation Program, and the Rental Housing Production Program and establishing a new Rental Housing Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; consolidating loan programs within the Department into a single program; providing for types of financing and repayment terms; establishing uses for loan proceeds; clarifying standards for multifamily loans; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670817/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {670817/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 30
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 31
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 35
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 34
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-102, 4-101, 4-103, 4-1205, 4-1207, 4-1208, 4-1501 through 4-1511, 4-213, 4-401 through 4-409, 4-401 through 4-411, 4-504, 4-901, 4-903, 4-905, 4-906, 4-907, 4-918, 4-921, 4-923, 4-929 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM