Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Treatment Criteria
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain carriers, on or before March 1 each year, to submit a report to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to demonstrate the carrier's compliance with the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act; requiring a carrier, on or before March 1 each year, to submit a report to the Commissioner on certain data for certain benefits by certain classification; establishing the Parity Enforcement and Education Fund to provide funds to support and conduct outreach to inform certain consumers of certain rights; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020, January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Treatment Criteria
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 4:59 PM