Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegates Kittleman, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ciliberti, Flanagan, Miele, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morgan, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, Rose, Shoemaker, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before July 1, 2018, the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to require a certificate holder applying for renewal of a certificate as a teacher to complete a course on understanding and recognizing the symptoms of visual impairments; requiring the Board to approve a course that meets specified criteria; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.2, 7-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM