Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Branch, Walker, Kaiser, D. Barnes, Boteler, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hornberger, Ivey, Long, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Smith, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for a certain amount of donations to certain qualified permanent endowment funds at Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, or University of Maryland Eastern Shore; requiring certain taxpayers to add a certain deduction back to federal adjusted gross income to determine Maryland adjusted gross income; limiting the amount of tax credit certificates certified by the Comptroller to no more than $240,000; applying the Act to certain taxable years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1665 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305567/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {119231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {305567/1 Adopted 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {119231/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-305, 10-730, 10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM