Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Cluster, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, A. Washington, West, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to establish a checkoff on the individual income tax return through which specified individuals may make a contribution to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to credit specified funds to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; providing that specified fees, fines and penalties that are assessed under the Election Law Article and the General Provisions Article be distributed to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925160/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-6)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209630/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (29-17)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments {925160/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-6) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {209630/1 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted (29-17) 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 13-239, 13-247, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309.1, 13-340, 13-409, 13-604, 13-604.1, 14-107, 15-103, 15-104.1, 15-107, 16-1003, 5-403 )
(   5-405, 5-903 )
(   2-113.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM