Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Neighborhoods Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Anderton, Carey, Cassilly, Holmes, Jalisi, Kipke, Otto, Robinson, Szeliga, West, Wivell, Clark, Folden, Jacobs, Lafferty, and McMillan
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-22)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Reducing the notice period from 14 days to 7 days before a landlord may file an action to evict a tenant for a breach of the lease that involves certain dangerous behavior; altering the requirements for the written notice that a landlord must give before the landlord may file a certain complaint to evict a tenant for a breach of a lease that involves certain dangerous behavior; reducing the amount of time after entry of a certain judgment during which a certain party may appeal to the circuit court in a certain eviction proceeding; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0555
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0706 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150110/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988177/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-18)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Holmes and Anderton)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Holmes and Anderton)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {988177/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Failed (20-22)
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {150110/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Safe Neighborhoods Act
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {988177/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (28-18) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Holmes and Anderton) 61
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Holmes and Anderton) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Committee Amendment {988177/1 Withdrawn 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Failed (20-22) 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM