Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Jalisi, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Campos, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hill, Impallaria, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a firefighter, an emergency medical technician, a rescue squad member, or any other first responder engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services; and increasing a specified penalty for assaulting specified individuals from 10 to 15 years imprisonment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM