Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Morales, Hayes, B. Robinson, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation; authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to review, examine, and assess issues related to disadvantaged, minority, and small businesses, including potential airport concessionaires, in Maryland; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1086
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM