Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Boteler, Dwyer, Impallaria, McComas, McDonough, Myers, Norman, Parrott, Stifler, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating for hunting and fishing licenses issued by the Department of Natural Resources an exception to the requirement that a licensing authority require a license applicant to disclose the Social Security number of the applicant and record the Social Security number on the application; altering the information that a request for information from a hunting or fishing license application made by the Child Support Enforcement Administration is required to contain under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-119.3 )
(   10-301, 4-202, 4-205, 4-604, 4-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM