Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the salary schedule for deputy sheriffs of Charles County to correspond to the Department of State Police salary schedule; authorizing sworn law enforcement officers and correctional officers in Charles County to collectively bargain with the County Commissioners, in addition to the Sheriff, with respect to specified matters; requiring the Sheriff and the County Commissioners to recognize specified exclusive representatives as of September 30, 2016, as the exclusive representatives of specified employees; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-26)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {460111/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (111-26) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Finance 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM