Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB1011)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0615
Title
Charles County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0097
Title
Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Refunds - Accrual of Interest
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0621
Title
Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 (SB0988)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB1011) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0133 /CH0615 Charles County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0097 Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 Charles County - Property Tax Refunds - Accrual of Interest By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0621 Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles County By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0957 (SB0988) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM