Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Anderson, Barve, Cluster, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Glass, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, S. Howard, Kittleman, Lam, Lierman, A. Miller, Moon, Queen, Robinson, Tarlau, Turner, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified hospitals to establish a specified substance use treatment program; providing that the purpose of the program is to identify patients in need of substance use treatment and, if appropriate, admit the patient or, if admission is not required, to direct the patient to an outpatient treatment setting; requiring specified hospitals to operate or contract to operate specified substance use treatment units or to refer specified patients to a specified treatment unit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - Requirements
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-219, 19-310.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM