Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized Charges
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of an E-ZPass account to report the theft of a transponder associated with the account to the Maryland Transportation Authority and a local law enforcement agency within 2 weeks of the first account statement after the theft and to report unauthorized charges to the account to the Authority; providing that the holder of an E-ZPass account is not responsible for unauthorized toll charges to the account under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790914/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {790914/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM