Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Angel, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, Bromwell, Chang, Cullison, Folden, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Hill, Impallaria, Jalisi, Jameson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Krimm, McConkey, A. Miller, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Rose, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take specified steps to provide for the adoption of a dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing specified research facilities to enter into specified agreements with animal rescue organizations for specified purposes; and requiring specified research facilities to submit specified information to the Secretary of Agriculture beginning on December 1, 2018, and each year thereafter.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0420
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0594 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM