Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Carr, Conaway, Dumais, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, O'Donnell, Pendergrass, Proctor, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring individualized education programs for blind or visually impaired children to provide orientation and mobility instruction under specified circumstances; establishing a specified process for a specified individualized education program team to make a specified determination as to whether specified orientation and mobility instruction is appropriate for a specified child and to include it in a specified child's individualized education program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0538
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665269/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {665269/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM