Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Rosenberg, Haynes, and Angel
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making legislative findings and declarations that it is necessary to regulate transfers of structured settlement payment rights to ensure that the transfers are effectuated on fair and reasonable terms and are in the best interest of payees, and to protect payees against deceptive practices; establishing specified requirements on a proposed transfer of structured settlement payment rights if the settlement was established in resolution of a tort claim seeking compensation for cognitive injuries arising from childhood exposure to lead paint; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0734
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862810/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {862810/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {208876/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1101, 5-1101.1, 5-1102, 5-1103, 5-1104, 5-1105, 5-1107 through 5-1112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM