Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a District Court commissioner to conduct specified duties relating to an initial appearance of a defendant in accordance with specified court rules; requiring a person arrested to be presented before a District Court judge for a specified initial appearance under specified circumstances; requiring a person arrested to be presented before a commissioner for a specified initial appearance under specified circumstances; requiring the Office of the Public Defender to provide representation at a specified appearance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-204, 5-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM