Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Aumann, Folden, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, W. Miller, Reilly, Rose, and Saab
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the limitation on the amount of military retirement income that may be subtracted from federal adjusted gross income for State income tax purposes; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM