Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Hornberger, Kittleman, McComas, Morgan, Rose, and Tarlau
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to administer the early learning assessment to enrolled prekindergarten students in the county; authorizing the assessment to be administered to a specified student for the purpose of identifying a disability; and requiring a county board to consult with prekindergarten teachers, including teachers nominated by the exclusive bargaining representative, in determining how to implement the assessment.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0667
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment - Moratorium
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment - Moratorium
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {295769/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text - Chapter - Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM