Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/18/2021 3:24:35 PM
Monday, January 18, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/17/2021 10:41 AM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Dels Clippinger and Queen

Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Del D.M. Davis

Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Del Williams, et al

Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Del Moon

Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Del Wilkins

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Del Proctor

Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
(Removed - 1/12/2021 3:26 PM)

Other
Legislative Policy Committee Live!
Created: 1/11/2021 3:18 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
End of 2020 Interim Items.

Montgomery
Canceled
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/9/2021 8:18 AM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders