Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass and Hammen
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, with specified exceptions, specified attachment points above which a medical stop-loss insurer assumes specified liability for losses incurred by an insured; applying the altered attachment points to renewal of a policy or contract of medical stop-loss insurance; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study of the use of medical stop-loss insurance in self-funded employer health plans and to submit specified reports to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0703
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206582/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {863420/1 Rejected (52-83)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {103624/1 Rejected (51-78)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {513629/1 Rejected (49-80)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {533021/1 Rejected (49-85)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {206582/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {863420/1 Rejected (52-83) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {103624/1 Rejected (51-78) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {513629/1 Rejected (49-80) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {533021/1 Rejected (49-85) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 64
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-129 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM