Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsored by
Delegates Schuh, Barnes, Beidle, Costa, Dwyer, Frush, George, Kipke, McConkey, McMillan, Pena-Melnyk, Sophocleus, Vitale, and Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on receipt of a specified permit application, to give notice immediately or require the applicant to give notice immediately by certified mail to specified counties and municipal corporations and to specified members of the General Assembly; requiring an applicant for a specified incinerator or landfill system to give notice of the application, informational meeting, and hearings to specified counties and municipal corporations and to members of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0563
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370617/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {370617/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-602, 2-404, 9-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM