Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Acevero, Bagnall, Bridges, Cain, Carr, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, C. Watson, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; repealing a provision that prohibits a county or municipal corporation from acting as an aggregator under certain circumstances; establishing a process by which, beginning on October 1, 2021, a county or municipal corporation or group of counties or municipal corporations may form or join a community choice aggregator; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0315
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0730 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 11:13 AM