Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a contract for the sale of residential real property in Montgomery County to contain a provision that provides notice of the Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit available through the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency's website, including an internet address that links to the Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit; requiring a certain contract to be independently initialed by the purchaser; providing that the failure of the vendor to include or the purchaser to initial certain contract provisions my not void the contract; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {150716/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
(   10-711, 14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page