Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Hixson, Oaks, Cardin, Tarrant, B. Robinson, Barve, Conaway, Glenn, Jones, O'Donnell, Proctor, Vaughn, Walker, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income related to the qualifying sale of a business enterprise that results in the creation of a specified business enterprise owned and controlled by specified individuals; allowing investors in specified business enterprises to claim a credit against the State income tax for specified investments; providing for the recapture of the subtraction modification and tax credit under specified circumstances; applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-207, 10-306, 10-307, 10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM