Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Patterson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a retiree of the State Police Retirement System to be reemployed in a permanent position, subject to specified limitations; requiring a retiree of the State Police Retirement System to earn service credit in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System under specified circumstances; and repealing a specified termination provision pertaining to the reemployment of retirees of the State Police Retirement System.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Reassigned to Appropriations 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2009, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM