Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Barkley, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lam, Luedtke, McDonough, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Reznik, Smith, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of June as Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and to urge the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Department of Aging, in conjunction with specified entities, to properly observe Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities, including specified summits and updates.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-504, 7-504 through 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM